Alan Douglas v. Superior Ct of California for Los Angeles County
Petitioner: Alan Douglas
Respondent: Superior Ct of California for Los Angeles County
Case Number: 2:2020cv07524
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to pet Alan Douglas, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #9 . (mat)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: denying #8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (mat)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #9 filed by Alan Douglas. CCA # 20-55919. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the (9th CCA) Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. [See document for more details.](mat)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55919 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #9 as to Petitioner Alan Douglas. (hr)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew, Related to: Order of Dismissal #5 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS ORDERED that the Petition be dismissed without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by petitioner Alan Douglas. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Alan Douglas. (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Alan Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 2254, #2 Part 2 of 2254, #3 Part 3 of 2254) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Douglas v. Superior Ct of California for Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Ct of California for Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?