United States of America v. 77,487.00 In U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: $77,487.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY and 77,487.00 In U.S. Currency
Claimant: Hiensley Fisher
Case Number: 2:2020cv07525
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Claimant Hiensley Fisher.(Schultz, Daniel)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 CLAIM filed by Claimant Hiensley Fisher. (Schultz, Daniel)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: It appears that the Verified Claim is filed on behalf of Claimant Hiensley Fisher, thus clerk has added this claimant to the docket sheet. On page 1, line 18, the document indicates, "Verified Claim of Kristopher Dion Howard..." As the signatures on the document are for Fisher, it appears that the name Howard was a clerical error. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the official government. (Whittlesey, Brent)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 CLAIM filed by Claimant 77,487.00 In U.S. Currency. (Schultz, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Complaint/Notice to seize defendant assets returned executed on 9/1/2020. Remarks: Seized $77,487.00 (20-DEA-657695) as 2:20-CV-07525 on 9/1/2020. (gk)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 WARRANT for seizure of $77,487.00 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (jp)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum by US Attorney re: Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Whittlesey, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 08/19/2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Whittlesey, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Whittlesey, Brent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Brent A Whittlesey added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Whittlesey, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 77,487.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Brent A Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brent A Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $77,487.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 77,487.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hiensley Fisher
Represented By: Daniel Brant Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?