Masreshaw Ayele et al v. Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Masreshaw Ayele, Ms. Marquita Tekoya Kersh, Marquita Kersh and Masreshaw Ayele
Defendant: Andres Conesa, Condon & Forsyth, LLP, Charles Carroll, Scott D Cunningham, Andrew Johnson, Javier Arrigunaga, Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Does 1-20, Condon and Forsyth, LLP and Scott Cunningham
Case Number: 2:2020cv07560
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss of for Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(1), 12(b)(6) and 9(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #18 presently scheduled for hearing on October 16, 2020, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted #18 filed by Defendants Condon and Forsyth, LLP, Scott Cunningham, Andrew Johnson. (Cunningham, Scott)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted #18 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Masreshaw Ayele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 4)(Stoll, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted #18 filed by Plaintiff Masreshaw Ayele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Stoll, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted #18 filed by Defendants Condon and Forsyth, LLP, Scott Cunningham, Andrew Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Proof of Service)(Cunningham, Scott)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by defendants Condon and Forsyth, LLP, Scott Cunningham, Andrew Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 10/16/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Condon and Forsyth, LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Scott Cunningham(pty:dft), Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Andrew Johnson(pty:dft)) (Cunningham, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAYING ACTION AS TO DEFENDANT AEROVIAS DE MEXICO, S.A. de C.V. ONLY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/26/2020, the Court ordered Plaintiffs to show cause why this action should not be dismissed as moot in light of Plaintiffs' finalized settlement with Aeromexico and acknowledged receipt of settlement funds #15 . On 9/1/2020, Plaintiffs filed a response asserting that this action is not moot because the settlement money was only delivered after the filing of this lawsuit, Plaintiffs were compelled to incur new costs and attorney's fees associated with this lawsuit, and Plaintiffs sustained additional damages as the result of Defendants' alleged intentional delays, malicious acts, and misrepresentations #16 . Notwithstanding the above, the Court takes judicial notice that Aeromexico Airlines filed a Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York, jointly administered under Case No. 20-11563. The Court accordingly stays this action as to Aeromexico Airlines in light of the filing of its Chapter 11 bankruptcy petition and the automatic stay provisions set forth in 11 U.S.C. Section 362(a)(1). The Court DISCHARGES the 8/26/2020 Order to Show Cause. The Court STAYS this action as to Defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., also known as Aeromexico Airlines, without prejudice to the parties moving to lift the stay and reopen as to that defendant when appropriate. The case will proceed as to all other defendants. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #15 . (Stoll, Robert)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., served on 8/20/20-8/27/20. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/21/2020, Plaintiffs Ayele and Kersh filed a request for voluntary dismissal of Ayele v. Federal Aviation Administration, et al., CV 18-6933-DMG ("Ayele I"). On 8/26/2020, the Court granted Plaintiffs' request for voluntary dismissal and dismissed Ayele I in its entirety, including all claims against Defendant Aeromexico Airlines. Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by no later than 9/2/2020 why this action should not be dismissed as moot in light of Plaintiffs' finalized settlement with Aeromexico and acknowledged receipt of settlement funds. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-06933-DMG(KSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07560-DMG(KSx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (ap)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/16/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 20, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Javier Arrigunaga, Charles Carroll, Condon and Forsyth, LLP, Andres Conesa, Scott Cunningham, Does, Andrew Johnson, filed by Plaintiffs Marquita Kersh, Masreshaw Ayele. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/14/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-06933-DMG-KS and 2:19-cv-04313-DMG-KS (Cunningham, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., identifying parent Grupo Aeromexico SA de CV; interested parties Condon & Forsyth LLP, Scott D. Cunningham, Andrew C. Johnson, Andres Conesa, Javier Arrigunaga and Charles Carroll. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. identifying Grupo Aeromexico S.A.B. de C.V. as Corporate Parent. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Cunningham, Scott)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CA Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV26498 Receipt No: ACACDC-27717266 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Attorney Scott D Cunningham added to party Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.(pty:dft))(Cunningham, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masreshaw Ayele et al v. Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Conesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condon & Forsyth, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Johnson
Represented By: Scott D Cunningham
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Represented By: Grace Mu-Ling Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Arrigunaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerovias de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Scott D Cunningham
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Represented By: Grace Mu-Ling Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condon and Forsyth, LLP
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Represented By: Grace Mu-Ling Lau
Represented By: Scott D Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Cunningham
Represented By: Scott D Cunningham
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Represented By: Grace Mu-Ling Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Masreshaw Ayele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Marquita Tekoya Kersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita Kersh
Represented By: Robert J Stoll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masreshaw Ayele
Represented By: Robert J Stoll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?