James Hampton v. Robert W. Fox et al
Plaintiff: James Hampton
Defendant: Institution Security Unit, Robert W. Fox, Receiving and Releasing Officers, Barba and L. Carlock
Case Number: 2:2020cv07562
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court previously received from Plaintiff, a Complaint/Petition/Notice of Removal without an accompanying IFP Request or payment of the filing fees. The Court sent a warning letter to Plaintiff advising that failure to correct this deficiency within THIRTY DAYS from the date of the warning letter would result in dismissal or remand of this case. More than THIRTY DAYS have now passed, and the deficiency has not been corrected. Accordingly, this case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED. No further filings shall be accepted under this case number. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: DENYING #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (shb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff James Hampton. (car) Modified on 8/24/2020 (car).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Barba, L. Carlock, Robert W. Fox, Institution Security Unit, Receiving and Releasing Officers pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, filed by Plaintiff James Hampton. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Hampton v. Robert W. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institution Security Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receiving and Releasing Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Carlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?