Humberto Gonzalez v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: Humberto Gonzalez
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2020cv07584
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . If Petitioner wishes to pursue this action, he must file a First Amended Petition naming the Warden as respondent and clearly describing his claims for relief by October 29, 2020. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank State Habeas Petition Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-126) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07584 JWH-ADS. (rrp)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth granting #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (kh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION #1 filed by Petitioner Humberto Gonzalez. (hr) Modified on 9/15/2020 (kh).
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Humberto Gonzalez. (hr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Humberto Gonzalez. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humberto Gonzalez v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Humberto Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?