Reni from Kameno v. James O Barr et al
Plaintiff: Reni from Kameno
Defendant: Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation, Sofia Shinas, Chad Stahelski, Schow David J., Eliza Hutton, Arman Rouhani, Crowvision, Inc., James O Barr, Gary Reed and Shirley John
Case Number: 2:2020cv07586
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
2 Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEES by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Finding that Plaintiff failed to show indigency, Judge Fernando Olguin denied Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis on 8/25/2020 and ordered Plaintiff to pay all filing fees in full within 30 days or face dismissal #6 . Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fees or otherwise respond to the Court's 8/25/2020 Order. As the time for doing so has now expired, the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-140) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07586 SB(PDx). (rn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (iv)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Reni from Kameno. (car)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Reni from Kameno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reni from Kameno v. James O Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward R. Pressman Film Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofia Shinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Stahelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schow David J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliza Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arman Rouhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowvision, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reni from Kameno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?