Henry Benjamin Phillips v. Craig Koenig
Petitioner: Henry Benjamin Phillips
Respondent: Craig Koenig
Case Number: 2:2020cv07612
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
2 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Order of the Court Dated September 28, 2020 #5 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. Petitioner's request for an extension of time is granted to the extent that he may have until November 11, 2020 to file his response. (hr)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-123) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07612 JWH-PD. (rrp)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to 12-28-2020 filed by Petitioner Henry Benjamin Phillips. (hr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Preliminary Review of Petition #1 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to respond no later than September 28, 2020 by electing one of the following options: 1. File a written response explaining why the Petition is not a second and successive petition or showing that the Ninth Circuit has authorized review of this petition AND how he has exhausted all of his claims on state direct or collateral review. 2. Voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice. (see document for further details). (Attachments: #1 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111) (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Henry Benjamin Phillips. (jtil)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254), filed by Petitioner Henry Benjamin Phillips. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Benjamin Phillips v. Craig Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Henry Benjamin Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?