In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc. et al
Appellee: Verity Health System of California, Inc., UMB Bank, N.A., Verity MOB Financing II, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Official Creditors Committee, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Verity MOB Financing, LLC
Appellant: Strategic Global Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07632
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES RELATED TO THE DISMISSAL MOTION AND VACATING HEARING DATE #36 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
October 15, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal / Joint Motion of Appellees Debtors and the Liquidating Trustee to Dismiss the Appeal as Moot #33 filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines)(Klausner, Gary)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Motion to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal / Joint Motion of Appellees Debtors and the Liquidating Trustee to Dismiss the Appeal as Moot #33 . The Court on its own motion continues the matter to 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. The motion was filed untimely. Counsel are to follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures when filing motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 12, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Peter Chadwick in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal / Joint Motion of Appellees Debtors and the Liquidating Trustee to Dismiss the Appeal as Moot #33 filed by Appellee Official Creditors Committee. (Behrens, James)
October 12, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal / Joint Motion of Appellees Debtors and the Liquidating Trustee to Dismiss the Appeal as Moot filed by Appellee Official Creditors Committee. (Behrens, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 10/29/2020. (jp)
September 29, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record on Appeal #1 . (jp)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (Dkt. Nos. #18 #22 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 10/28/2020. (twdb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability: Certificate of Readiness re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (twdb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION to Joint REQUEST to Strike New Declaration Evidence Not Presented to the Bankruptcy Court NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergen #22 - Opposition to "Appellees' Joint Request to Strike New Declaration Evidence Not Presented to the Bankruptcy Court" - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc. to Brief (non-motion non-appeal), #21 - SGMs Reply To Joint Supplemental Brief of Appellees.... - (Klausner, Gary)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 - SGMs Supplemental Me #18 filed by Appellee Official Creditors Committee. (Behrens, James)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: At the request of counsel the telephonic hearing in this matter is continued to September 30, 2020 at 9:00 AM**, unless the Court determines no hearing is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: At the request of counsel the telephonic hearing in this matter is continued to September 30, 2020 at 3:00 p.m., unless the Court determines no hearing is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2020 Filing 22 Joint REQUEST to Strike New Declaration Evidence Not Presented to the Bankruptcy Court NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 - SGMs Supplemental Me #18 , Declaration (Motion related),, #19 , Declaration (Motion related),, #20 Appellees' Joint Request to Strike New Declaration Evidence Not Presented to the Bankruptcy Court filed by Appellees Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Moyron, Tania)
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Appelle Official Creditors Committee, Verity Health System of California, Inc.. regarding Response in Opposition to Motion #10 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 , Order on Motion to Stay Order (other), #17 . (Behrens, James)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of William E. Thomas in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 - SGMs Supplemental Me #18 - Declaration of William E. Thomas in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Kevin D. Rising in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 - SGMs Supplemental Me #18 - Declaration of Kevin D. Rising in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 - SGMs Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Limited Stay Pending Appeal - filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Klausner, Gary)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Issuing Limited Stay and Setting Supplemental Briefing Schedule and Continued Hearing Date Regarding Emergency Motion for Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 . A continued telephonic hearing on this matter is scheduled for 9/28/2020 at 3:00 PM., unless the Court determines no hearing necessary. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Dale S. Fischer. (jp)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING (Non-Evidentiary - Held and Completed) - Emergency Motion for Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The parties are to submit further cross briefing (15 pages) and responsive cross-briefing (7 pages) and the matter will be set for hearing. The Court encourages the parties to resolve the matter. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo - telephonic. (jp)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Motion to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 . The Court sets a telephonic hearing for 9/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. The call in instructions will be emailed to counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 SGM's Reply To "Debtors' Opposition To... Emergency Motion To Stay Confirmation Order" filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc. (Klausner, Gary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc., In re Debtor Verity Health System of California, Inc.. Re: Response in Opposition to Motion #10 in Support Of Debtors Opposition To Strategic Global Management, Inc.s Emergency Motion To Stay Confirmation Order (Attachments: #1 Tab 1 - Declaration Of Richard G. Adcock In Support Of Emergency First-Day Motions, #2 Tab 2 - Order Authorizing The Sale to SGM, #3 Tab 3 - Order Vacating Hearing On Debtors Motion For Approval of DS, #4 Tab 4 - Emergency Motion For Authorization To Close St. Vincent Medical, #5 Tab 5 - Memorandum of Decision n To Close SVM, #6 Tab 6 - Order Granting Debtors Emergency To Close SVM, #7 Tab 7 - Order Authorizing The Sale to Prime Healthcare, #8 Tab 8 - Order Authorizing The Sale of The Debtors Assets To The Chan Soon-Shion, #9 Tab 9 - Order Granting Motion To Approve Private Sale re Seton Assets to AHMC, #10 Tab 10 - Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation, #11 Tab 11 - Disclosure Statement Describing Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan, #12 Tab 12 - Order Granting Joint Motion For An Order Approving Proposed Disclosure Statement, #13 Tab 13 - Stipulation To Amend The Fourth Amended Supplemental Cash Collateral Order, #14 Tab 14 - Final Order Approving Stip To Amend Fourth Amended Supp Cash Collateral Order, #15 Tab 15 - Certification Of Andres A. Estrada With Respect To The Tabulation, #16 Tab 16 - Memorandum of Law In Support of Confirmation of Second Amended Joint Plan, #17 Tab 17 - Notice of Occurrence of Closing Date of Sale of Seton Medical Center, #18 Tab 18 - Notice of Occurrence of Closing Date of Sale of St. Francis Medical, #19 Tab 19 - Debtors Response To Limited Objection of Strategic Global Management, Inc., #20 Tab 20 - Modified Second Amended Plan, #21 Tab 21 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Reference, #22 Tab 22 - First Amended Complaint For Breach Of Contract, Promissory Fraud, Breach Of Implied Covenant Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing, #23 Tab 23 - Defendants Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, #24 Tab 24 - Defendants First Amended Answer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, #25 Tab 25 - August 12, 2020 Hearing TranscriptD)(Moyron, Tania)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION filed by Appellee Verity Health System of California, Inc., In re Debtor Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Attorney Tania M Moyron added to party Verity Health System of California, Inc.(pty:db))(Moyron, Tania)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-10352-DSF. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07632-DSF. Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (ap)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 Appellant's Appendix And Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal (Klausner, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Gary E. Klausner Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal #5 Declaration of Gary E. Klausner in Support Of Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice Of Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Klausner, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Appeal Emergency Motion For Order Granting Limited Stay Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. (Attorney Gary E Klausner added to party Strategic Global Management, Inc.(pty:a)) (Klausner, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellant Strategic Global Management, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-00613-DSF; 2:19-cv-10352-DSF; 2:19-cv-01354-DSF; 2:19-cv-01356-DSF (Klausner, Gary)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 8/21/2020. (jtil)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Plaintiff Strategic Global Management, Inc. Re: Order Confirming Modified Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan (Dated July 2, 2020) of the Debtors, the Committee, and the Prepetition Secured Creditors entered on 8/14/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Ernest M. Robles, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 8/20/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:18-bk-20151, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Verity Health System of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Represented By: Tania M Moyron
Represented By: Samuel R Maizel
Represented By: Nicholos A Kiffroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul J Ricotta
Represented By: Daniel S Bleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verity MOB Financing II, LLC
Represented By: Bruce S Bennett
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Megan M Preusker
Represented By: Clark T Whitmore
Represented By: Jason Reed
Represented By: Nathan F Coco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Creditors Committee
Represented By: James Cornell Behrens
Represented By: Gregory Allan Bray
Represented By: Mark Shinderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul J Ricotta
Represented By: Daniel S Bleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verity MOB Financing, LLC
Represented By: Bruce S Bennett
Represented By: Peter S Saba
Represented By: Benjamin Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Strategic Global Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gary E Klausner
Represented By: Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?