Proshak v. Warden of FCC Lompoc
Petitioner: Yaroslav Proshak
Respondent: Warden of FCC Lompoc
Case Number: 2:2020cv07639
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 OPPOSITION filed by Respondent Warden of FCC Lompoc. (Attorney Claire Yan added to party Warden of FCC Lompoc(pty:res))(Yan, Claire)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT / PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY #1 by Judge George H. Wu. The Government is ordered to respond by September 28, 2020. The Petitioner will have until October 28, 2020 to file his reply. The Petition will be deemed submitted upon the filing of the reply. (mrgo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu for petition filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. (lh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) (Filing Fee $5 PAID), filed by Petitioner Yaroslav Proshak. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proshak v. Warden of FCC Lompoc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of FCC Lompoc
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Claire Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yaroslav Proshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?