Janet Allison v. Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Janet Allison
Defendant: Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv07858
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicholas S Politis counsel for Defendant Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.. Adding Nicholas S. Politis as counsel of record for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Politis, Nicholas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd..(Attorney Melody C Chang added to party Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chang, Melody)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Janet Allison, upon Defendant Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon c/o JESSIE GASTELUM AT CT CORPORATION, AGENT FOR SERVICE in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Naylor, Charles)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd. (ghap)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by PLAINTIFF JANET ALLISON. (Naylor, Charles)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF JANET ALLISON, (Naylor, Charles)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JANET ALLISON. (Naylor, Charles)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27822487 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF JANET ALLISON. (Attorney Charles D Naylor added to party JANET ALLISON(pty:pla))(Naylor, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet Allison v. Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Allison
Represented By: Charles D Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Criuse Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Nicholas S Politis
Represented By: Melody C Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?