Peter Beshai v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Beshai
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2020cv07867
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for February 8, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jamie Rudman re: Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Rudman, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
August 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/26/20 SEE EXHIBIT 3 TO THE REMOVAL DOCKET NO. 1) filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(lc)
August 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Peter Beshai, upon Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CT Corporation Systems in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 7/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 27, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Peter Beshai. Filed in State Court on 8/27/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Rudman, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Rudman, Jamie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV28223 Receipt No: ACACDC-27824514 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Attorney Jamie Rudman added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Rudman, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Beshai v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Rudman
Represented By: Jessica M Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Beshai
Represented By: Dana L Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?