MDR Hotels, LLC v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: MDR Hotels, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, The Dow Chemical Company, Marathon Oil Company and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08008
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #34 to 11/2/2020. (jp)
October 2, 2020 Filing 34 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/02/2020 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Rose Alexander in Support of Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Standing Order filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leslie, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Joel A. Blanchet re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,, #27 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Blanchet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28027756) #23 filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Leslie, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-08008 DSF(JPRx). (rn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 29 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Leslie, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 28 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company. (Alexander, Mary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Blanchet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28027756) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: Granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Blanchet APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, designating Michael R. Leslie as local counsel. (et)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: Granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher D Barraza APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, designating Michael R. Leslie as local counsel. (et)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. Heiden MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Marathon Oil Company, designating Michael A. Hale as local counsel. (et)
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel A. Blanchet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28027756) filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leslie, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher D. Barraza to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Dow Chemical Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28023062) filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leslie, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Thomas J. Heiden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Marathon Oil Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28005771) filed by defendant Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hale, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Minute Order and Notice Regarding Assignment of Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Leslie, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marathon Oil Company answer now due 10/8/2020; The Dow Chemical Company answer now due 10/8/2020, filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company.(Alexander, Mary)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #17 , Stipulation for Extension of Time / Proposed Order #16 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The document is stricken and the parties are directed to file a Stipulation for Extension of Time that complies L.R. 8-3. (hr)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time / Proposed Order #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: - Incorrect stipulation for extension of time. - Proposed order not required. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 **STRICKEN PER DOCKET NO. #18 ** STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to TBD filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, Mary) Modified on 9/4/2020 (hr).
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Alan Hale on behalf of Defendant Marathon Oil Company (Hale, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Shannon Lankenau on behalf of Defendant Marathon Oil Company (Lankenau, Shannon)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. (see document for further details) (hr)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company, identifying Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, The Dow Chemical Company, and MDR Hotels, LLC. (Alexander, Mary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company identifying Marathon Oil Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Alexander, Mary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER filed by Defendant Marathon Oil Company joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Alexander, Mary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of Defendant Marathon Oil Company (Attorney Mary Rose Alexander added to party Marathon Oil Company(pty:dft))(Alexander, Mary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Barraza. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joel Blanchet. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
September 1, 2020 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff MDR Hotels, LLC, upon Defendant Marathon Oil Company served on 8/3/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
September 1, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Marathon Oil Company, The Dow Chemical Company, filed by plaintiff MDR Hotels, LLC. (filed in state court 7/31/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on 09/01/2020. (Leslie, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc.. (Leslie, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company identifying Dow Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Leslie, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Leslie, Michael)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV28908 Receipt No: ACACDC-27888530 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Leslie In Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 01, #3 Exhibit 02, #4 Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 04, #6 Exhibit 05, #7 Exhibit 06, #8 Exhibit 07, #9 Exhibit 08, #10 Exhibit 09) (Attorney Michael R Leslie added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Leslie, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDR Hotels, LLC v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Michael R Leslie
Represented By: Michael R. Leslie
Represented By: Christopher D. Barraza
Represented By: Peter Hsiao
Represented By: Joel A. Blanchet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Michael Alan Hale
Represented By: Shannon Lankenau
Represented By: Thomas J Heiden
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MDR Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Perry S. Hughes
Represented By: Kevin M. Hannifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?