Lisa Corson v. Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv08083
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC, (Singletary, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC.(Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC(pty:dft))(Singletary, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David K Plourde\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC. (esa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, identifying ALOHA DESERT RENTALS, LLC. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27926841 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Lisa Corson(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Corson v. Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Desert Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Singletary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Corson
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Elina Eteri Kharit
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?