Gina Paialii et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Leroy Paialii, Elizabeth Hill and Gina Paialii
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08187
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Debi F Chalik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii, designating Michael A Simmrin as local counsel. (jp)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Gina Paialii, Elizabeth Hill, Leroy Paialii. upon Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/9/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield. (Simmrin, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Nield, Edgar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-03167 DSF(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08187 DSF(JCx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (esa)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Debi F. Chalik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27981132) filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Application of Non-Resident Attorney to appear pro hac vice) (Simmrin, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii, (Simmrin, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii. (Simmrin, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Hill, Gina Paialii, Leroy Paialii. (Simmrin, Michael)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27980846 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Gina Paialii, Elizabeth Hill, Leroy Paialii. (Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Elizabeth Hill(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Gina Paialii(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Simmrin added to party Leroy Paialii(pty:pla))(Simmrin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gina Paialii et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Paialii
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Represented By: Debi F Chalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Hill
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Represented By: Debi F Chalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Paialii
Represented By: Michael A Simmrin
Represented By: Debi F Chalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Edgar R Nield
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?