Lloyd Mosley v. Hastings Village Investment Company LP, et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Mosley
Defendant: Hastings Village Investment Company LP and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2020cv08258
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20GDCV00633, acknowledged on 10/22/2020. (iv)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 600 E Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hastings Village Investment Company LP.(Hurley, Gregory)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
September 9, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Hastings Village Investment Company LP, filed by plaintiff Lloyd Mosley. (filed in state court 8/3/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hastings Village Investment Company LP (Hurley, Gregory)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hastings Village Investment Company LP. (Hurley, Gregory)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20GDCV00633 Receipt No: ACACDC-28007834 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hastings Village Investment Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Hastings Village Investment Company LP(pty:dft))(Hurley, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd Mosley v. Hastings Village Investment Company LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Mosley
Represented By: E Dayton Magallanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hastings Village Investment Company LP
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?