Graciela Diaz v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Graciela Diaz
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commisioner, Social Security Administration and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv08260
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sarah Cho (Cho, Sarah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sarah Cho (Cho, Sarah)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sarah Cho (Cho, Sarah)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by unspecified means. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Sarah Cho (Cho, Sarah)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details). (et)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (et)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo: Granting #2 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (et)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz. (Cho, Sarah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz. (Cho, Sarah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz, (Cho, Sarah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Graciela Diaz filed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order for request to proceed in forma pauperis) (Cho, Sarah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Graciela Diaz. (Attorney Sarah E Cho added to party Graciela Diaz(pty:pla))(Cho, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graciela Diaz v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Diaz
Represented By: Sarah E Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commisioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?