Amparo Retana v. Nutribullet, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Amparo Retana
Defendant: Call to Action, L.L.C, Capital Brands, L.L.C., NUTRIBULLET, LLC, Nutriliving, L. L. C., Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., Nutribullet, L.L.C. and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08284
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06894 DDP(SSx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08284 DDP(GJSx). Signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (rn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 18 . Document # 18 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 9/14/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 21] 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. (ghap) Modified on 9/14/2020 (ghap).
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutriliving, L. L. C. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Call to Action, L.L.C. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital Brands, L.L.C. (ghap)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-00828-DDP; 2:17-cv-03358-DDP; 2:17-cv-09161-DDP; 2:18-cv-02336-DDP; 2:18-cv-03025-DDP; 2:18-cv-03046-DDP; 2:18-cv-03858-DDP; 2:18-cv-03941-DDP; 2:18-cv-04800-DDP; 2:18-cv-05413 DDP; 2:18-cv-06126-DDP; 2:18-cv-05829-DDP; 2:18-cv-08613-DDP; 2:18-cv-08720-DDP; 2:18-CV-08771-DDP; 2:18-cv-08778-DDP; 2:18-cv-10194-DDP; 2:19-cv-00305-DDP; 2:19-cv-00359-DDP; 2:19-cv-00376-DDP; 2:19-cv-00402-DDP; 2:19-cv-00424-DDP; 2:19-cv-00447-DDP; 2:19-cv-00917-DDP; 2:19-cv-02356-DDP; 2:19-cv-02543-DDP; 2:19-cv-02546-DDP, 2:19-cv-02555-DDP, 2:19-cv-02572-DDP; 2:19-cv-02601-DDP; 2:19-cv-02613-DDP; 2:19-cv-02619-DDP; 2:19-cv-2696-DDP; 2:19-cv-03384; 2:19-cv-03385, 2:19-cv-03388, 2:19-cv-03399, 2:19-cv-03421 (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana, identifying Nutribullet, L.L.C, Nutriliving,L.L.C., Capital Brands, L.L.C., Call to Action, L.L.C, Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Amparo Retana. Adding Douglas Rochen as counsel of record for Amparo Retana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Amparo Retana. Adding Boris Treyzon as counsel of record for Amparo Retana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff Amparo Retana. Adding Aaron Lavine as counsel of record for Amparo Retana for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Lavine, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28021408 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Amparo Retana. (Attorney Aaron Lavine added to party Amparo Retana(pty:pla))(Lavine, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amparo Retana v. Nutribullet, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amparo Retana
Represented By: Aaron Lavine
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Douglas A Rochen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Call to Action, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Brands, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUTRIBULLET, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutriliving, L. L. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?