Heather Le et al v. Compass Airlines LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Heather Le
Defendant: Compass Airlines LLC and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2020cv08296
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Good cause appearing, the Court's OSC is hereby DISCHARGED. (iv)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on October 30, 2020. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Heather Le.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Owen, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, #10 re Remand (Terhar, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by 9/23/2020 why this action should not be remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely file a satisfactory response by this deadline will result in the remand of this action. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLC.(Terhar, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLC, RE REMOVAL DOCUMENTS served on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Terhar, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
September 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Compass Airlines LLC, Does 1-50. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Heather Le. Filed in State Court on 8/13/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLC, identifying Trans States Holdings, Inc. and Starr Surplus Line Insurance Company. (Terhar, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLC. (Terhar, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV30770 Receipt No: ACACDC-28024486 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Compass Airlines LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Michael J Terhar added to party Compass Airlines LLC(pty:dft))(Terhar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heather Le et al v. Compass Airlines LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Airlines LLC
Represented By: Michael J Terhar
Represented By: Jonathan E Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Le
Represented By: Brian J Panish
Represented By: Andrew P Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?