Lisa Bryant v. Walmart Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Bryant
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Does 1 to 99, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08328
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Excusable Neglect re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #15 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Colbert, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY Reply in Support of a Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant. (Novak, Sean)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael F. Colbert, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Colbert, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Remand to State Court)(Novak, Sean)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Memorandum in Support of Motion #9 , Notice of Withdrawal of Memorandum #12 , for the following reasons: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Document linked incorrectly to the wrong documen/docket entry, all the documents are attached incorrectly. Other: Very sloppy work by attorney. The attachment #9 , DOES NOT match docket text and title form on docket 12 is incorrect. Attorney used "Bankruptcy". (bm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/9/20. Notice of Withdrawal of Memorandum in Support of Motion #9 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant. (Novak, Sean) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bm).
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of SEAN M. NOVAK In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant. (Novak, Sean)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Novak, Sean)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 10/9/20. MEMORANDUM in Support Motion for Order Remanding the Matter to State Court filed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant. (Novak, Sean) Modified on 10/9/2020 (bm).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for January 25, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
September 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Walmart Inc. (filed in state court 7/10/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa)
September 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Lisa Bryant, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 6/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 6/15/20, submitted as document 3, p. 49) (esa)
September 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Walmart Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Lisa Bryant. (filed in state court 4/10/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Colbert, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of State Court File re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Colbert, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Colbert, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV14174 Receipt No: ACACDC-28043193 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Declaration of Michael F. Colbert) (Attorney Michael Colbert added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Colbert, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Bryant v. Walmart Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew O Smith
Represented By: Michael Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 99, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bryant
Represented By: Sean M Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?