Janet Snyder v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Janet Snyder
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc. and Teva Womens Health, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv08357
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #23 Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Hammers Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff, designating Lauren A. Welling as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 27, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Hammers Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Janet Snyder (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28734579) filed by Plaintiff Janet Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE) (Welling, Lauren)
October 25, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket No. #19 ) wherein the parties indicate that: (1) the Plaintiff has filed a motion to remand the case back to state court; (2) the Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss; and (3) the parties have stipulated to have the remand motion heard on December 3 and the motion to dismiss heard on December 14. In light of the above, the Court continues the scheduling conference now set for October 26, 2020 to December 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically at Monday's scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATES ON MOTION TO REMAND [ECF 11] AND MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF 16] by Judge George H. Wu. The hearings re Motion or Report and Recommendation deadlines originally scheduled have been rescheduled: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF 11] is continued from November 12, 2020 to December 3, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.; The hearing on Defendants The Cooper Companies and CooperSurgical, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss [ECF 16] is continued from November 23, 2020 to December 14, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.; Opposition and reply dates shall be based on the new hearing dates. (mrgo)
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 8-10 days, filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc... (Jones, Allison)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Dates Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) #16 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lauren A. Welling, #2 Declaration Rex A. Littrell, #3 Proposed Order)(Jones, Allison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., (Jones, Allison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(2) AND 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Jones, Allison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Teva Women's Health, LLC.(Jones, Allison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Teva Womens Health, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Janet Snyder. (Welling, Lauren)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Janet Snyder. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA STATE COURT, #2 Exhibit A Cooper-Teva Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit B LLC Conversion Certificate Copy, #4 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO CALIFORNIA STATE COURT, #5 Certificate of Service) (Welling, Lauren)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Janet Snyder pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Without Prejudice as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Welling, Lauren)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for October 26, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than October 15, 2020. (lc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
September 11, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Janet Snyder. (filed in state court 8/13/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 11) (esa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Allison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. identifying The Cooper Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Allison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Jones, Allison)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV30597 Receipt No: ACACDC-28048931 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party CooperSurgical, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party The Cooper Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet Snyder v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Represented By: Kevin W Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Snyder
Represented By: Timothy M Clark
Represented By: Lauren A Welling
Represented By: Robert M. Hammers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?