In Re Parvin Jamali
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Appellant: Parvin Jamali
Case Number: 2:2020cv08394
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, on October 5, 2020 #8 , issued an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has failed to respond, the Court orders the case dismissed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2020.) (mrgo)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding No Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, or Notice of Transcript filed forwarded to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (mrgo)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Does not include entered stamped copy of order, judgment, or decree forwarded to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (ghap)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 9/11/2020. (ghap)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: copy of order, judgment or decree is not included entered on 9/2/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Neil W Bason, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 9/11/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:20-bk-12732-NB, Adversary number: 2:20-AP-1068-NB, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellant Parvin Jamali. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Parvin Jamali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kevin R Broersma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Parvin Jamali
Represented By: Michael Shemtoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?