United States of America v. All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ALL FUNDS HELD IN ESCROW BY CLYDE & CO. IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS DAMAGES OR RESTITUTION IN PETROSAUDI V. PDVSA UNCITRAL ARBITRATION and All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration
Interested Party: PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. and Clyde & Co LLP
Case Number: 2:2020cv08466
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #93 and #94 set for Monday, September 13, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Unopposed Application for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further to Motion to Dismiss Verified Third Amended Complaint In Rem #101 and Claimants Sur-Reply is hereby deemed filed. (jp)
September 5, 2021 Filing 101 APPLICATION for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claimant's Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Dyanne J. Cho added to party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.(pty:ip)) (Cho, Dyanne)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, the Government's Application #99 is GRANTED. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 2, 2021 Filing 99 APPLICATION for Leave to file sur-reply filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Sohn, Joshua)
August 30, 2021 Filing 98 REPLY in further support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Third Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 90] #94 filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr. in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #4 Declaration of James Lewis QC in Support of Reply, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Lewis QC, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Lewis QC)(Steinberg, Zoe)
August 30, 2021 Filing 97 REPLY in support of APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #93 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
August 17, 2021 Filing 96 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Third Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 90] #94 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A)(Sohn, Joshua)
August 17, 2021 Filing 95 OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #93 Claimant's Opposition to Request for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Steinberg, Zoe)
August 3, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Third Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 90] filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Steinberg, Zoe)
August 3, 2021 Filing 93 APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Application set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Sohn, Joshua)
July 28, 2021 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott Joseph Fishwick counsel for Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Scott J. Fishwick is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Fishwick, Scott)
July 28, 2021 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zoe M. Steinberg counsel for Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Adding Zoe M. Steinberg as counsel of record for PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attorney Zoe M. Steinberg added to party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.(pty:ip))(Steinberg, Zoe)
July 6, 2021 Filing 90 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #53 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sohn, Joshua)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #61 ); Order DENYING Ex Parte Application for Arrest Warrant (Dkt. No. #54 ) Leave to amend is granted. An amended complaint must be filed no later than 7/6/2021. Claimant's response will be due 8/3/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Adjourning Scheduling Conference Sine Die #87 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 26, 2021 Filing 87 Joint STIPULATION for Order Adjourning Scheduling Conference Sine Die filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Adjourning Scheduling Conference Sine Die)(Fishwick, Scott)
May 19, 2021 Filing 86 REPLY filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. to Notice of Lodging #85 (Fishwick, Scott)
May 18, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (New Proposed Warrant for Arrest in Rem) re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #54 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant)(Sohn, Joshua)
May 17, 2021 Filing 84 MINUTES OF GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF AW ARRANT IN REM #54 and CLAIMANT PEROSAUDI OIL SERVICES (VENEZUELA) LTD'S MOTION TO DISMISS VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN REM #61 held before Judge Dale S. Fischer. See minutes for specifics. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo - VTC. (lom)
May 12, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY in further support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Second Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 53]) #61 filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Fishwick, Scott)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #81 Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth P Foley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd., designating Scott J Fishwick as local counsel. (jp)
May 6, 2021 Filing 81 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Foley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31252439) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Fishwick, Scott)
May 4, 2021 Filing 80 REPLY IN OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #54 (Claimant's Surreply in Opposition) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Further Declaration of Hon. James Lewis QC in Support)(Fishwick, Scott)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (dkt. #71 ) is granted. The Court accepts the Opposition filed On April 30, 2021. Any Reply is due no later than May 12, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 30, 2021 Filing 78 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Second Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 53]) #61 (Conditional Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A)(Sohn, Joshua)
April 29, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Notice of Interested Parties) (Sohn, Joshua)
April 29, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd., (Fishwick, Scott)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Claimant's ex parte application is GRANTED IN PART. Claimant may file a surreply no later than May 4, 2021 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 29, 2021 Filing 74 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Witness Statement of Jonathan Rainer [ECF 70-2] or in the alternative EX PARTE APPLICATION to File a Surreply to Government's Reply (ECF 70) #73 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
April 27, 2021 Filing 73 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Witness Statement of Jonathan Rainer [ECF 70-2] or in the alternative, EX PARTE APPLICATION to File a Surreply to Government's Reply (ECF 70) filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Claimant's Ex Parte Application) (Fishwick, Scott)
April 27, 2021 Filing 72 [PROPOSED ORDER filed as] SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #71 (Proposed Order for Motion) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua) Modified on 4/28/2021 (lom).
April 26, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 5/24/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Sohn, Joshua)
April 26, 2021 Filing 70 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #54 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A)(Sohn, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR. The Warrant was issued in error. The Court strikes the documents at 66 and 68 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2021 Filing 68 ** STRICKEN** WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM #54 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
April 22, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Warrant In Rem Issued 66 . Incorrect event used. Judge's order to be re-docketed. (lom)
April 22, 2021 Filing 66 **STRICKEN** WARRANT IN REM as to All funds held in escrow by Clyde & Co. (or successor institution) in the United Kingdom as damages or restitution in the UNCITRAL arbitration between PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. and PDVSA Servicios S.A. et al. issued. (lom)
April 22, 2021 Filing 65 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Second Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 53]) #61 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The Document is Accepted; however, the parties must file their Notice of Interested parties no later than April 29, 2021. (rfi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #61 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 21, 2021 Filing 63 Withdrawal of Statement of Interest of Clyde & Co LLP filed by Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP re: Statement #22 (Roth, Jerome)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
April 19, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Verified Second Amended Complaint in Rem [ECF 53]) filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Fishwick, Scott)
April 19, 2021 Filing 60 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #54 (Claimant's Opposition to Government's Renewed Request for Issuance of Arrest Warrant in Rem) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Hon. James Lewis QC in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - March 23, 2021 High Court Order, #3 Exhibit 2- Funds Exchange (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 - Court Funds Rules 2011, #5 Exhibit 4 - Court Funds Request for Deposit, #6 Exhibit 5 - 1994 MLAT US - UK, #7 Exhibit 6 - Treaty Instrument, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2003 MLAT US - EU, #9 Exhibit 8 - PCOA 2005 Order)(Fishwick, Scott)
April 8, 2021 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Sean M. Fern re Amended Complaint/Petition, #53 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Claimant's response to the government's ex parte application #54 for an arrest warrant is due April 19. The government's response is due April 26. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 3, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Order Filed in UK Action filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 March 23, 2021 UK Order)(Fishwick, Scott)
April 2, 2021 Filing 56 OBJECTIONS to Reply (Motion related), #55 (Government's Opposition to Claimant's Request for Briefing Schedule) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
April 1, 2021 Filing 55 REPLY to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem #54 Requesting Briefing Schedule on Pending Application filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Request)(Fishwick, Scott)
March 30, 2021 Filing 54 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Sohn, Joshua)
March 29, 2021 Filing 53 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration amending Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sohn, Joshua)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion to Dismiss; Order DENYING Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. Nos. #25 , #34 ). The government may file an amended complaint no later than 3/29/2021. Claimants responsive motion or pleading is to be filed no later than 4/19/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Clyde Uk's Time to Respond to Complaint #50 to 6/24/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 4, 2021 Filing 50 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 24, 2021 filed by Defendant Clyde & Co LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levin, Daniel)
March 3, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Decision: Rendered in UK Action filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Fishwick, Scott)
February 22, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE (SUPPLEMENTAL) of Filing in UK Action filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Fishwick, Scott)
February 22, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing in Parallel UK Action filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sohn, Joshua)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #34 set for February 10, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The court, on its own motion, continues the Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem #34 The Motion is continued to 2/10/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2021 Filing 44 REPLY in Further Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem #34 filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr. in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr.)(Fishwick, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 43 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem #34 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Budiman Lutfi Mohamed)(Sohn, Joshua)
January 7, 2021 Filing 42 REPLY in Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Under 18 U.S.C. 983(j) #25 Surreply in Opposition filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mohd Yusof Bin Hj Zainal Abiden)(Fishwick, Scott)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING CLAIMANT PETROSAUDI OIL SERVICES (VENEZUELA) LTD.'SAPPLICATION TO FILE A SURREPLY #39 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #25 set for Monday, January 11, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2021 Filing 39 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file a Surreply ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd's Application to File a SurReply) (Fishwick, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Filing 38 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 10/27/2020 and 11/25/2020 upon All potential claimants All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration last date of publication 11/25/2020, answer due 12/15/2020; Clyde & Co LLP last date of publication 11/25/2020, answer due 3/24/2021; PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. last date of publication 11/25/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Sohn, Joshua)
December 28, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Under 18 U.S.C. 983(j) #25 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Budiman Lufti Mohamed)(Sohn, Joshua)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, the Government's Application #35 is GRANTED. The Government shall have 25 pages for its Reply Brief. (jp)
December 23, 2020 Filing 35 APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Reply Brief in Support of Section 983(j) Motion filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sohn, Joshua)
December 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr. in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #5 Declaration of the Hon. James Lewis QC Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6), #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #8 Exhibit C to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #9 Declaration of Mohd Yusof Bin Hj Zainal Abiden in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(6), #10 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Service (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint in Rem) (Fishwick, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Under 18 U.S.C. 983(j) #25 filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr. in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Opposition to the Government's Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of David B. Rivkin, Jr., #7 Declaration of Anthony David Kerman in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Opposition to the Government's Motion for Protective Order, #8 Declaration of the Hon. James Lewis in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Opposition to the Government's Motion for Protective Order, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #10 Exhibit B to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #11 Exhibit C to Declaration of Hon. James Lewis, #12 Declaration of Mohd Yusof Bin Hj Zainal Abiden in Support of Claimant Petrosaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.'s Opposition to the Government's Motion for Protective Order)(Fishwick, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan R Barr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd., designating Scott J Fishwick as local counsel. (jp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan R. Barr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29605832) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Fishwick, Scott)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Clyde UK's Time to Respond to Complaint to 3/24/2021 #29 . (jp)
December 15, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 24, 2021 filed by Defendant Clyde & Co LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Clyde UK's Time to Respond to Complaint)(Levin, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B New APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd, designating Scott J Fishwick as local counsel. (jp)
December 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Barbara Y Levy on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Barbara Y Levy added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Levy, Barbara)
December 11, 2020 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. New to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29490047) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Fishwick, Scott)
December 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order Under 18 U.S.C. 983(j) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order) (Sohn, Joshua)
December 3, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin A Devine counsel for Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. Adding Colin A. Devine as counsel of record for Clyde & Co LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. (Attorney Colin A Devine added to party Clyde & Co LLP(pty:ip))(Devine, Colin)
December 3, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin counsel for Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. Adding Daniel B. Levin as counsel of record for Clyde & Co LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. (Attorney Daniel Benjamin Levin added to party Clyde & Co LLP(pty:ip))(Levin, Daniel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 STATEMENT of Interest of Clyde & Co LLP (Roth, Jerome)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jerome C Roth counsel for Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. Adding Jerome C. Roth as counsel of record for Clyde & Co LLP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party Clyde & Co LLP. (Attorney Jerome C Roth added to party Clyde & Co LLP(pty:ip))(Roth, Jerome)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Time to Respond to Complaint #19 , that the time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint for Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. is extended to 1/4/2021. (jp)
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. answer now due 1/4/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Claimant PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd..(Fishwick, Scott)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney David B Rivkin, Jr., APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd., designating Scott J Fishwick as local counsel. (jp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David B. Rivkin, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29086259) filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Fishwick, Scott)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT Interest and Verified Claim filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. (Fishwick, Scott)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott Joseph Fishwick counsel for Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. Adding Scott J. Fishwick as counsel of record for PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Interested Party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.. (Attorney Scott Joseph Fishwick added to party PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.(pty:ip))(Fishwick, Scott)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Issued by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (jp)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 Second EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Sohn, Joshua)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sohn, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Warrant for Arres in rem #9 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant) (Sohn, Joshua)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01899 DSF(VBKx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08466 DSF(PLAx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum of Conflict re Magistrate Judge (Sohn, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 9/16/2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Sohn, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): 16-5366 (Sohn, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Attorney Joshua L Sohn added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Sohn, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL FUNDS HELD IN ESCROW BY CLYDE & CO. IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS DAMAGES OR RESTITUTION IN PETROSAUDI V. PDVSA UNCITRAL ARBITRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds Held in Escrow by Clyde and Co. In The United Kingdom as Damages or Restitution in Petrosaudi v. PDVSA Uncitral Arbitration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joshua L Sohn
Represented By: Jonathan T. Baum
Represented By: Joshua L. Sohn
Represented By: Barbara Y Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PetroSaudi Oil Services (Venezuela) Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Joseph Fishwick
Represented By: David B. Rivkin, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan B. New
Represented By: Jonathan R Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Foley
Represented By: Zoe M. Steinberg
Represented By: Zoe M Steinberg
Represented By: Dyanne J. Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clyde & Co LLP
Represented By: Colin A Devine
Represented By: Jerome C Roth
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?