C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc. v. Virginia Transport LLC et al
Plaintiff: C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Virginia Transport LLC, Dean S. Norris and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv08563
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Virginia Transport LLC an Illinois limited liability company, and Dean S. Norris an individual. (mrgo)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Dean S. Norris, Virginia Transport LLC filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc., upon Defendant Dean S. Norris served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hughes, Bradford)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc., upon Defendant Virginia Transport LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dean Norris, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hughes, Bradford)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. See document for details. (et)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Dean S. Norris. (ghap)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Virginia Transport LLC. (ghap)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc., (Hughes, Bradford)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28149678 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.. (Attorney Bradford G Hughes added to party C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hughes, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc. v. Virginia Transport LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.Y. Brothers Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford G Hughes
Represented By: Tiffany Baci Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean S. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?