Brian Whitaker v. Bernard Perloff et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Bernard Perloff, Roger E. Webster, Jean Marie Webster, Tasture LLC, and Jean-Marie Webster
Case Number: 2:2020cv08656
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The Court hereby vacates all currently set dates, with the expectation that the parties will file a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal within 60 days. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Seabock, Amanda)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #12 served on 10-20-2020. (Handy, Russell)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Bernard Perloff(representative capacity as trustee of The Bernard Perloff Trust dated September 4, 1986, as amended and restated July 24, 2008) served on 10/18/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Served Mayra Flores Leasing Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (shb)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Tasture LLC, served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mrs. Patel -Authorized to except on behalf Alex Patel in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Roger E. Webster(in individual) served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020; Roger E. Webster(representative capacity as trustee of The Roger and Jean Marie Webster Trust) served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Ortiz - Employee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Jean-Marie Webster(in individual) served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020; Jean-Marie Webster(representative capacity as trustee of The Roger and Jean Marie Webster Trust) served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Ortiz - Employee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE EXERCISE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION RE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act and other state law claims asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than October 22, 2020. See order for further details. (shb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bernard Perloff (representative capacity as trustee of The Bernard Perloff Trust dated September 4, 1986, as amended and restated July 24, 2008), Bernard Perloff (in individual ), Tasture LLC,, Jean-Marie Webster(in individual), Jean-Marie Webster (representative capacity as trustee of The Roger and Jean Marie Webster Trust), Roger E. Webster (in individual), Roger E. Webster (representative capacity as trustee of The Roger and Jean Marie Webster Trust). (et)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28182800 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Bernard Perloff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Perloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger E. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Marie Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasture LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Marie Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?