Carmen John Perri v. Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Defendant: Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive and Mohammad Z. Noori
Case Number: 2:2020cv08678
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc, Mohammad Noori. (iv)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc., Mohammad Z. Noori filed by plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default) (Manning, Joseph)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than DECEMBER 7, 2020. BY DEFENDANTS: RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT OR BY PLAINTIFF: APPLICATIONS FOR CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action on DECEMBER 8, 2020. (iv)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Mohammad Z. Noori served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc. served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perrito Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Perri)(Manning, Joseph)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before OCTOBER 7, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (iv)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Mohammad Z. Noori. (esa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc. (esa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28190537 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perri v. Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best L.A. Electrical and Lighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Z. Noori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?