L.A. Specialty Produce Co. v. Ideal Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: L.A. Specialty Produce Co. doing business as Vesta Foodservice
Defendant: Nicole Rivers, Ideal Foods, LLC, Nikki Steven, Nikki Rivers and Nicole Steven
Case Number: 2:2020cv08722
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants time to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended to and including December 15, 2020. (mrgo)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 15, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Monroe, June)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Ideal Foods, LLC served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Benamatti, administrative assistant to Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Monroe, June)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Ideal Foods, LLC, and Nicole Rivers. (jtil)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., (Monroe, June)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 9/23/2020, receipt number 28205830), filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney June T Monroe added to party L.A. Specialty Produce Co.(pty:pla))(Monroe, June)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.A. Specialty Produce Co. v. Ideal Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Steven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A. Specialty Produce Co. doing business as Vesta Foodservice
Represented By: June T Monroe
Represented By: Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?