Terry Pizzo v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Terry Pizzo
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv08753
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 11/25/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terry Pizzo, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susie Vang, Authorized Agent at CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chandler, Corinne)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (ghap)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry Pizzo, (Chandler, Corinne)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terry Pizzo. (Chandler, Corinne)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Pizzo. (Chandler, Corinne)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28213844 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Terry Pizzo. (Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Terry Pizzo(pty:pla))(Chandler, Corinne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry Pizzo v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Pizzo
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?