Dennis Seider et al v. City of Malibu
Plaintiff: Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust
Defendant: City of Malibu
Case Number: 2:2020cv08781
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Mark Miller on behalf of Plaintiffs Dennis Seider, Leah Seider. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. See document for details. (et)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark Miller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant City of Malibu. (jtil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust, identifying City of Malibu. (Talcott, Jeremy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust. (Talcott, Jeremy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust. (Talcott, Jeremy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28227238 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1976 permit, #2 Exhibit 2 - photo of crossbeams, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCC letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - June emails, #5 Exhibit 5 - June 15 email, #6 Exhibit 6 - June 26 emails, #7 Exhibit 7 - Survey, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sept. 10 email) (Attorney Jeremy Brennan Talcott added to party Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust(pty:pla))(Talcott, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis Seider et al v. City of Malibu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Malibu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Seider and Leah Seider, as Trustees of the Seider Family Trust
Represented By: Jeremy Brennan Talcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?