Carmen John Perri v. Adore Kings, LP et al
Plaintiff: CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual, and Carmen John Perri
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, ADORE KINGS, LP, a California limited partnership, Does 1-10, inclusive and Adore Kings, LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv08810
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction and DISMISSING Plaintiff's Unruh Claim by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh claim. The Court therefore dismisses that claim without prejudice. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Adore Kings, LP answer now due 12/2/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Adore Kings, LP.(Attorney Elizabeth S Minoofar added to party Adore Kings, LP(pty:dft))(Minoofar, Elizabeth)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Adore Kings, LP served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perrito Order to Show Cause #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration JRM, #2 Declaration of Perri)(Manning, Joseph)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than 10/5/2020. (See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics). (jp)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Adore Kings, LP. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28235744 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perri v. Adore Kings, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADORE KINGS, LP, a California limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adore Kings, LP
Represented By: Paul W Cane, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth S Minoofar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN JOHN PERRI, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?