Brian Whitaker v. Pacific Investments I and M LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Victor Tapia, Pacific Investments I & M LLC and Pacific Investments I and M LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv08823
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED THAT the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that judgment be entered dismissing this action, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute and comply with the orders of the court. (iv)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Denying #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation. (iv)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Pacific Investments I and M LLC. Application set for hearing on 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Marc Cohen added to party Pacific Investments I and M LLC(pty:dft)) (Cohen, Marc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT VICTOR TAPIA WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action is dismissed, without prejudice, as to defendant Victor Tapia for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and comply with the orders of the court. (iv)
October 18, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Pacific Investments I and M LLC served on 10/17/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Delma Lopez ( Authorized to accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 10/8/2020. (Handy, Russell)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Victor Tapia served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: ADA ACCESSIBILTY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Pacific Investments I and M LLC, Victor Tapia. (ghap)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28243105 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Pacific Investments I and M LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Investments I & M LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Investments I and M LLC
Represented By: Marc Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?