Denise Marie Davis v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Denise Marie Davis
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv08857
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-8857 MRW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis. (Rosales, Steven)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 10/7/2020, answer due 2/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL(JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT Updated March 2020) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Minute Order for details) (vm)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (esa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (esa)
September 28, 2020 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-28276972 for $400 filing fee. (Rosales, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis, (Rosales, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis. (Rosales, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis. (Rosales, Steven)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Denise Marie Davis. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Denise Marie Davis (pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denise Marie Davis v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Marie Davis
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?