Genesis Insurance Company v. County of Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Genesis Insurance Company
Defendant: County of Ventura and Craig Coley
Case Number: 2:2020cv08899
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint)(Tartaglio, David)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Karen L Toto APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C Eggert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Benjamin Eggert's VA GSC is attached to Karen L. Toto's phv application. Karen L. Toto GSC from VA is not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): VA missing. (Thrasher, Lupe)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10385 JWH(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08899 JWH(JDEx). Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08899 MWF(JCx). (rn)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Craig Coley, County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Craig Coley) (lh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons - Craig Coley)(Tartaglio, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, identifying General Reinsurance Corporation, the corporate parent of Genesis Insurance Company; General Re Corporation, the corporate parent of General Reinsurance Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, the corporate parent of General Re Corporation. (Tartaglio, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Tartaglio, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28280725 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint) (Attorney David A Tartaglio added to party Genesis Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Tartaglio, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genesis Insurance Company v. County of Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesis Insurance Company
Represented By: David A Tartaglio
Represented By: Karen L. Toto
Represented By: David A. Tartaglio
Represented By: Benjamin C. Eggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?