Erica Henderson v. Jovita Carranza
Petitioner: Erica Henderson
Respondent: Jovita Carranza
Case Number: 2:2020cv08920
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (iv)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #9 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson. (dml)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #5 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff SHALL resubmit the completed form within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (iv)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Erica Henderson in Support of Petitioner's Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus, re Petition (case opening) #1 filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson. (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson, (lh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed against Jovita Carranza, filed by Petitioner Erica Henderson. (lh) (Additional attachment(s) #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erica Henderson v. Jovita Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jovita Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erica Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?