Wesley Sinnathamby v. Michael Duane Inscore et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Sinnathamby
Defendant: Vidal Guerrero, Juana Genoveva Sotoma Murrillo, Cynthia Huseman, Maria Salud Murrillo, Susana Lopez Gamez, Kenneth Mariano Huseman, Michael Duane Inscore, Susana Lopez, Inc., Ejido Primo Tapia, Joi Inscore and Juana Genoveva Sotomayor Murillo
Case Number: 2:2020cv08930
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Motion to Vacate Judgment (Dkt. No. #11 ). The amended complaint must be filed no later than 12/7/2020. (MD JS-5. Case Reopened.) See Order for specifics. (jp)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion for Modification and Reconsideration of Order and Judgment of October 5, 2020 #11 set for November 30, 2020, at 1:30 p.m., off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Judgment #10 , Order #9 . Motion for Modification and Reconsideration of Order for Dismissal and Judgment of October 5, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Wesley Sinnathamby. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meir J. Westreich, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order) (Westreich, Meir)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer that Plaintiff take nothing and the action be dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. DISMISSING Case for Lack of Subject MatterJurisdiction. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ejido Primo Tapia, Susana Lopez Gamez, Vidal Guerrero, Cynthia Huseman, Kenneth Mariano Huseman, Joi Inscore, Michael Duane Inscore, Susana Lopez Gamez, Maria Salud Murrillo, Juana Genoveva Sotomayor Murillo, Susana Lopez, Inc. (et)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wesley Sinnathamby. (Westreich, Meir)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wesley Sinnathamby, (Westreich, Meir)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wesley Sinnathamby. (Westreich, Meir)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28296190 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wesley Sinnathamby. (Attorney Meir J Westreich added to party Wesley Sinnathamby(pty:pla))(Westreich, Meir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley Sinnathamby v. Michael Duane Inscore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vidal Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Genoveva Sotoma Murrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Huseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Salud Murrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Lopez Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Mariano Huseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Duane Inscore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Lopez, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ejido Primo Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joi Inscore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Genoveva Sotomayor Murillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Sinnathamby
Represented By: Meir J Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?