Nathan Parker et al v. Garcias Pizza II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Parker and Karla Terry
Defendant: Adam Bros. Farming, Inc., Garcia's Pizza II, Inc., d/b/a Gino's Pizza, United Foods, Inc. and Garcias Pizza II, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Ginos Pizza
Case Number: 2:2020cv09076
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING APPOINTMENT OF SETTLEMENT GUARDIAN AD LITEM 21 , #23 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Settlement Guardian ad Litem: William Dussault is a person found or known by the court to be a suitable, disinterested person having the requisite knowledge, training and expertise to perform the duties required by Cal. Code Civ. P. 372 and California Rules of Court 3.1384 and is hereby appointed to represent the interests of the named minor or incapacitated person. (hr)
November 18, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of William Dussault re Order to Show Cause, #25 filed by Plaintiff Nathan Parker. (Marler, William)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court amends its previous Order (Docket No. 22); the Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem 21 shall remain sealed. However, the Amended Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem #23 is referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for decision. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Child by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing no later than November 24, 2020 why William Dussault should be appointed as guardian ad litem for L.P., a minor child, in light of Mr. Dussault's failure to submit a declaration stating that his appointment will not cause a conflict of interest. (see document for further details) (hr)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended PETITION for Appointment of William Dussault as Guardian ad Litem for L.P. #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Motion noticed before incorrect Judge. All documents must be noticed to and served courtesy copies to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (See G.O. 05-07). You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
November 16, 2020 Filing 23 Amended PETITION for Appointment of William Dussault as Guardian ad Litem for L.P. filed by Plaintiff Nathan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dussault CV, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Marler, William)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court has sealed the Petition for Appointment of Settlement Guardian ad Litem 21 (the "Petition"), because it includes the full name of the minor. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to publicly file a redacted version of the Petition that complies with FRCP Rule 5.2 and Local Rule 5.2-1. Once the redacted version of the Petition is filed, the Court will grant it and issue the Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting #17 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (et)
October 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Application to file under seal #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application to file under seal is lacking accompanied documents. Refer to L.R. 79-5.2.2 for proper filing instructions. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
October 27, 2020 Filing 18 First APPLICATION for Settlement Approval of Good Faith Settlement with Garcia's and United Foods filed by Plaintiff Nathan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gino's, #2 Exhibit United Foods, #3 Exhibit Bouldin Report, #4 Exhibit Kobayashi Report, #5 Exhibit Atkinson Report, #6 Exhibit Garcia's Insurance Policy, #7 Exhibit United Foods Insurance Policy, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting) (Marler, William)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 First APPLICATION to file document Unredacted Underseal SDL under seal filed by Plaintiff Nathan Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted SDL, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marler, William)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement with Garcia's and United filed by Plaintiff Nathan Parker. (Marler, William)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney William D. Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nathan Parker and Karla Terry,, designating Frederic Gordon as local counsel #9 . (iv)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is accepted as filed. (iv)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William Dale Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28492164) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (Thrasher, Lupe)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. upon United Foods, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Alan M. Maxell. (Gordon, Frederic)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. upon Garcias Pizza II, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Ernst. (Gordon, Frederic)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. upon Adam Bros. Farming, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey M. Lenkov. (Gordon, Frederic)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William Dale Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28492164) filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gordon, Frederic)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William D Marler on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Adam Bros. Farming, Inc., Garcias Pizza II, Inc., United Foods, Inc. (et)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry, (Gordon, Frederic)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. (Gordon, Frederic)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. (Gordon, Frederic)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28363382 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Parker, Karla Terry. (Attorney Frederic L Gordon added to party Nathan Parker(pty:pla), Attorney Frederic L Gordon added to party Karla Terry(pty:pla))(Gordon, Frederic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan Parker et al v. Garcias Pizza II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Parker
Represented By: Frederic L Gordon
Represented By: Frederic L. Gordon
Represented By: William D. Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Terry
Represented By: Frederic L Gordon
Represented By: Frederic L. Gordon
Represented By: William D. Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bros. Farming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia's Pizza II, Inc., d/b/a Gino's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcias Pizza II, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Ginos Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?