Joshua Grossman v. One Technologies LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Grossman
Defendant: One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com, DOES 1-100, inclusive,, One Technologies LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Freescore.360.com and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv09077
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #12 filed by Plaintiff Joshua Grossman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cruz, Veronica)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court has received and reviewed the parties Joint FRCP Report (Docket No. #11 ) and Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Docket No. #12 ) which is set for December 17, 2020. To avoid multiple court appearances, the scheduling conference now set for November 19, 2020, is continued to December 17, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joshua Grossman, (Cruz, Veronica)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan J. Weintrop, #2 Declaration of Astra Zittlau with Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Rothman, Ari)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Joshua Grossman.. (Cruz, Veronica)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to One Technologies LLC answer now due 11/6/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC.(Rothman, Ari)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
October 2, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Joshua Grossman, upon Defendant One Technologies LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 9/4/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Ari Rothman, counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 7) (esa)
October 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, One Technologies LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Joshua Grossman. (filed in state court 8/25/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan J Weintrop counsel for Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com. Adding Bryan J. Weintrop as counsel of record for One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com. (Attorney Bryan J Weintrop added to party One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com(pty:dft))(Weintrop, Bryan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com. (Rothman, Ari)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com (Rothman, Ari)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com, (Rothman, Ari)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Central, case number 20STCV32345 Receipt No: ACACDC-28363488 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum, #5 Exhibit 5 First Amended General Order, #6 Exhibit 6 Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit 7 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt) (Attorney Ari N Rothman added to party One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com(pty:dft))(Rothman, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua Grossman v. One Technologies LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Technologies LLC d/b/a Freescore360.com
Represented By: Bryan J Weintrop
Represented By: Ari N Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Technologies LLC a Texas limited liability company doing business as Freescore.360.com
Represented By: Bryan J Weintrop
Represented By: Ari N Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Grossman
Represented By: Veronica Cruz
Represented By: David J McGlothlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?