Chong Sul Kim v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Petitioner: Lory C. Torres, Acting Secretary CHAD F WOLF, LA District Director Donna Campagnolo, USCIS, Chong Sul Kim and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Lory Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Donna Campagnolo and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv09165
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES AND DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #8 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) Petitioner Chong Sul Kim's application for naturalization is REMANDED for adjudication to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). USCIS shall adjudicate Petitioner's naturalization application, which involves any and all necessary actions (such as re-fingerprinting and re-interviewing Petitioner, and issuing a request for evidence) and the issuance of a decision on Petitioner's application for naturalization--all within 60 days after entry of this order. (2) For purposes of this order, this time frame is limited to the decision by USCIS on Petitioner's application for naturalization, and does not include any decision by USCIS regarding any subsequent administrative appeal Petitioner may ultimately file (pursuant to 8 C.F.R. Section 336.2) in the event the application is denied. (3) If USCIS does not issue a decision on Petitioner's application for naturalization within the timeframe set forth above, Respondents shall not oppose any request by Petitioner to this Court to vacate this order. (4) This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (gk)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by Respondents Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Lory Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Donna Campagnolo(pty:res), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:res), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Lory Torres(pty:res), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:res), Attorney Damon A Thayer added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res))(Thayer, Damon)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chong Sul Kim, (Aquino, Romben)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondents Donna Campagnolo, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Lory Torres, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (et)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chong Sul Kim. (Aquino, Romben)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28411617 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chong Sul Kim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Romben Estrada Aquino added to party Chong Sul Kim(pty:bkmov))(Aquino, Romben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chong Sul Kim v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lory C. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Acting Secretary CHAD F WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chong Sul Kim
Represented By: Romben Estrada Aquino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lory Torres
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Damon A Thayer
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?