Larissa Mogavero v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Larissa Mogavero
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv09294
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (lh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 57 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 10/08/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 1:20-CV-01341-DAD-SKO from U.S. Distric Court Eastern District of California (Fresno). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB (FMMx). (lh)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-57). CASE TRANSFERRED to Central District of California. MDL 2814. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicholas Ryan Colletti on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Colletti, Nicholas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 18-ml-2814-AB-PVC by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 21, 2020 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-9128048. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Merced County Superior Court, case number 20CV-00129 by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #2 Declaration of Nicholas R. Colletti, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B - Redacted, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Certificate of Interested Parties, #15 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larissa Mogavero v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larissa Mogavero
Represented By: David N Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Colletti
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?