Miguel Delgado v. Gavin Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Delgado
Defendant: Ralph Diaz, B. Martinez, Gavin Newsom, Christianson and R.C. Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv09324
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2020. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Miguel Delgado. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Miguel Delgado. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/13/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christianson, Ralph Diaz, R.C. Johnson, B. Martinez, Gavin Newsom. Filed by Miguel Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)Conformed Copy sent via U.S.Mail Modified on 10/1/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel Delgado v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?