Eric Njokom v. El Camino Community College District
Case Number: 2:2020cv09422
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/14/2020 TRANSFERRING CASE to the Central District of California, Western Division. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 9, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for ELECTRONIC FILING by Eric Njokom. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eric Njokom. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against El Camino Community College District by Eric Njokom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Njokom v. El Camino Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?