Irma Chavez v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: IRMA CHAVEZ
Defendant: 1-50 DOES, Target Corporation and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv09426
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN PART FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE STANLEY BLUMENFELD, JR.: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-09426 SB(PDx). (rn)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
October 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Target Corporation in Los Angeles Superior Court on 10/14/2020, attached as Exhibit E. (jtil)
October 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Irma Chavez in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/8/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CORPORATION TARGET, identifying Target Corporation. (Flinders, Ethan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CORPORATION TARGET. (Flinders, Ethan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPERIOR-LASC, case number 20STCV34044 Receipt No: ACACDC-28535258 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CORPORATION TARGET. (Attorney Ethan L Flinders added to party CORPORATION TARGET(pty:dft))(Flinders, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irma Chavez v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-50 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Ethan L Flinders
Represented By: Martin Douglas Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMA CHAVEZ
Represented By: Paul S Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?