Maya Hayuk v. Sung Brothers Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Maya Hayuk
Defendant: Fairfield Properties, L.P., Fairfield Property Management, Inc., Sung Brothers Corp. and Sung Brothers Corp. doing business as Splendid 4D Studio
Case Number: 2:2020cv09440
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Sung Brothers Corp. (mrgo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Fairfield Properties, L.P. (mrgo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Fairfield Property Management, Inc.. (mrgo)
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Baldridge, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Baldridge, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Baldridge, Elizabeth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Maya Hayuk, designating Kevin L. Vick as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/22/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28667091) filed by plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Granting #10 , #12 Non-Resident Attorney Seth A. Walters APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk, designating Kevin L. Vick as local counsel. (et)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28667091) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth A. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/22/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28667091) filed by plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09440 SVW(PVCx). (rn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Seth A. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28667258) filed by plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Maya Hayuk (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28667091) filed by plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vick, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Seth Walters on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Y Silverstein on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Maya Hayuk. (Vick, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Vick, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Maya Hayuk, identifying Maya Hayuk, Sung Brothers Corp., Fairfield Property Management, Inc., Fairfield Properties, L.P.. (Vick, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28540094 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Maya Hayuk. (Attorney Kevin L Vick added to party Maya Hayuk(pty:pla))(Vick, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maya Hayuk v. Sung Brothers Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Properties, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Property Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Brothers Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Brothers Corp. doing business as Splendid 4D Studio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Hayuk
Represented By: Kevin L Vick
Represented By: Kevin L. Vick
Represented By: Aaron Y. Silverstein
Represented By: Seth A. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?