Billy Alfaro v. Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Petitioner: Billy Alfaro
Respondent: Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Case Number: 2:2020cv09554
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Texas Eastern
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING VENUE. It is ORDERED that this petition for writ of habeas corpus is TRANSFERRED to the Western Division of the United States District Court for the Central District of California.Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 09/29/2020. (bmf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
September 23, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Billy Alfaro. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bjc, ) (Originally filed in 1:19cv11) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDERED that the above-referenced 12 motion for emergency injunction (construed as a motion to amend) is stricken from the pleadings in this closed petition. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the pleading as a new civil action and the claims shall proceed as a separate petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 USC 2241. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/23/2019. (bjc, )(Original order filed in 1:19cv11) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billy Alfaro v. Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, FCI Beaumont Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?