Joseph R. Meehan v. Pelle Tsichlis
Plaintiff: Joseph R Meehan and Joseph R. Meehan
Defendant: Pelle Tsichlis and Pelle Primeau
Case Number: 2:2020cv09623
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the Motions Hearing set for December 21, 2020 will be held telephonically at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following conference call information: Number: (877) 411-9748; Access Code: 6448503. Counsel are ordered to remain available from 10:00 a.m. - 11:00 a.m. Any tentative ruling the Court may prepare, will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendant Pelle Tsichlis. (Lewis, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen New to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pelle Tsichlis, designating Jeffrey Lewis as local counsel #14 . (iv)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen P. New to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pelle Tsichlis (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29293590) filed by Defendant Pelle Tsichlis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Joseph R. Meehan in support of opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Joseph R. Meehan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Utzurrum, Joe)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Plaintiff Joseph R. Meehan. (Utzurrum, Joe)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pelle Tsichlis, (Lewis, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss Case #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Pelle Tsichlis. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey Lewis added to party Pelle Tsichlis(pty:dft)) (Lewis, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-08802 MWF(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Andre Birotte Jr to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09623 MWF(Ex). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pelle Tsichlis. (ghap)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph R Meehan. (Utzurrum, Joe)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph R Meehan, (Utzurrum, Joe)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Joseph R Meehan. (Utzurrum, Joe)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28624485 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Joseph R Meehan. (Attorney Joe Utzurrum added to party Joseph R Meehan(pty:pla))(Utzurrum, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph R. Meehan v. Pelle Tsichlis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Meehan
Represented By: Joe Utzurrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Meehan
Represented By: Joe Utzurrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelle Tsichlis
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Stephen P. New
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelle Primeau
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Stephen P. New
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?