Rainfield Ranches LP et al v. Morita Produce
Plaintiff: Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. d/b/a RMG Produce, Rainfield Ranches LP and Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. doing business as RMG Produce
Defendant: Morita Produce
Case Number: 2:2020cv09862
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiffs Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc., Rainfield Ranches LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Secretary of State Information re Morita Produce, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Diligence from Process Server re Agent Address, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Diligence re Residence Address)(Medvei, Sebastian)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that PLAINTIFF show cause in writing not later than June 11, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In accordance with Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7.15, oral argument shall not be heard in the above matter unless so ordered by the Court. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of briefs. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider a proof of service of summons and complaint on defendant on or before the above date, as a satisfactory response to theOrder to Show Cause. (shb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc., Rainfield Ranches LP, (Medvei, Sebastian)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc., Rainfield Ranches LP. (Medvei, Sebastian)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Morita Produce. (jtil)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (jtil)
October 29, 2020 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-28770486 for $400 filing fee. (Medvei, Sebastian)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. d/b/a RMG Produce, Rainfield Ranches LP. (Medvei, Sebastian)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Rainfield Ranches LP, Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. d/b/a RMG Produce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Rainfield LP Invoices, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - RMG Produce Invoices, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - RMG Produce Reparation Order, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Rainfield LP Reparation Order) (Attorney Sebastian M. Medvei added to party Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. d/b/a RMG Produce(pty:pla), Attorney Sebastian M. Medvei added to party Rainfield Ranches LP(pty:pla))(Medvei, Sebastian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainfield Ranches LP et al v. Morita Produce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morita Produce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. d/b/a RMG Produce
Represented By: Sebastian M. Medvei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainfield Ranches LP
Represented By: Sebastian M. Medvei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rainfield Marketing Group, Inc. doing business as RMG Produce
Represented By: Sebastian M. Medvei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?