Crystal A. Chatman v. Centinela Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Crystal A. Chatman
Defendant: Nicholas Islas, Dr. Cornell Kirkland, Cornell Kirkland and Centinela Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv09874
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Crystal A. Chatman. (jp)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Crystal A. Chatman. (ghap)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Crystal A. Chatman. (ghap)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Centinela Medical Center, Nicholas Islas(Director/Coorddinator Patient Affairs, official capacity), Nicholas Islas(individual), Cornell Kirkland(Medcare Doctor, official capacity), Cornell Kirkland(individual).Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia A Donahue. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Crystal A. Chatman. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crystal A. Chatman v. Centinela Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Islas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cornell Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centinela Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal A. Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?