Agustin Frayde et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Agustin Frayde and Margarita Frayde
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, DOES 1-10, inclusive, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv09925
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen L Stevenson. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-09925 MCS(KSx). (esa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Mase, Andrew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association.(Mase, Andrew)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (car)
October 28, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Plaintiffs Agustin Frayde, Margarita Frayde. Filed in State Court on 10/8/2020 Submitted with Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan identifying U.S. Bancorp as Corporate Parent. (Ryan, Timothy)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan. (Ryan, Timothy)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles - Norwalk District, case number 20NWCV00548 Receipt No: BCACDC-28752535 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Timothy M Ryan added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy M Ryan added to party U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan (pty:dft))(Ryan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agustin Frayde et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Represented By: Katherine K Meleski
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee (Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association) as Trustee for Morgan
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Represented By: Katherine K Meleski
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Frayde
Represented By: Peter L Nisson
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Fernando Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Frayde
Represented By: Peter L Nisson
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Fernando Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?