Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Hikvision USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Hikvision USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv09995
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hikvision USA Inc. answer now due 2/3/2021, filed by Defendant Hikvision USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Proposed Order PROPOSED Order re Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Corr, Steven)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #16 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Hikvision USA Inc.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint in the case is continued until 1/4/2021. (gk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hikvision USA Inc. answer now due 1/4/2021, filed by Defendants Hikvision USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3))(Attorney Steven John Corr added to party Hikvision USA Inc. (pty:dft))(Corr, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/17/2020, Receipt No. 29048493) filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC, designating Steven Ritcheson as local counsel #12 , #14 . (gk)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29048493) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Missing FL. Proposed order needs to be flattened. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing FL. Incorrect judges initials are listed. Proposed order needs to be flattened. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Howard L. Wernow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29048493) filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:20-cv-09995 AB(AFMx). (rn)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Howard L. Wernow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Hikvision USA Inc. (car)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC, identifying NONE. (Ritcheson, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28785493 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Attorney Steven W Ritcheson added to party Stormborn Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Hikvision USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikvision USA Inc.
Represented By: Steven John Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?