Phyllis Colleen Ball v. Bowlero Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Colleen Ball
Defendant: AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation, Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Bowlero Corporation and AMF Bowling Centers Inc. doing business as Bowlero Clovis Erroneously Sued As Bowlero Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv10050
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendants AMF Bowling Centers Inc., Bowlero Corporation.. (Morris, Ashley)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-10050-GW-JPRx. (aco)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant AMF Bowling Centers Inc.. (Morris, Ashley)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (vm)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) by AMF Bowling Centers Inc. dba Bowlero Clovis filed by Defendant AMF Bowling Centers Inc..(Morris, Ashley)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
November 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Bowlero Corporation, Does, filed by plaintiff Phyllis Colleen Ball. (filed in state court 1/31/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 11) (esa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on November 2, 2020. (Morris, Ashley)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation, (Morris, Ashley)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation. (Morris, Ashley)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fresno, case number 20KCECG00107 Receipt No: ACACDC-28816519 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint and initial State Court documents) (Attorney Ashley R Morris added to party AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation(pty:dft))(Morris, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phyllis Colleen Ball v. Bowlero Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Colleen Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMF BOWLING CENTERS, INC. DBA BOWLERO CLOVIS, erroneously sued as Bowlero Corporation
Represented By: Ashley R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowlero Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMF Bowling Centers Inc. doing business as Bowlero Clovis Erroneously Sued As Bowlero Corporation
Represented By: Ashley R Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?