Kelly Lancaster v. Radnet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kelly Lancaster
Defendant: Radnet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10180
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Joint Stipulation Requesting Order Regarding Scheduling and Extension of Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification [DE 13] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court ORDERS as follows: Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 42(a)(2), the Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Lancaster v. Radnet, Inc., 2:20-cv-10180-RGK-SK and Horowitz et al v. Radnet, Inc., 2:20-cv-10328-RGK-SK with this case under case number 2:20-cv-09553-RGK-SK; Case Nos. 2:20-cv-10180-RGK-SK and 2:20-cv-10328-RGK-SK are now closed. Counsel are directed to file all further documents under Case No. 2:20-cv-09553-RGK-SK only; The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs in the consolidated case leave to file a consolidated complaint by no later than 1/8/2021; All pending motions for appointment of lead counsel in this case and the related cases are DENIES as moot, without prejudice to the refiling of same. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
December 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT WILLIAM B. FEDERMAN AS LEAD COUNSEL AND GREEN & NOBLIN, P.C. AS LIAISON COUNSEL, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, APPOINT CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND GREEN & NOBLIN, P.C. AS LIAISON COUNSEL, #2 Proposed Order) (Green, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William B. Federman counsel for Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. Adding William B. Federman as counsel of record for Kelly Lancaster for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. (Federman, William)
December 3, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Radnet, Inc. answer now due 12/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Radnet, Inc..(Burgin, Alisha)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster, designating James Robert Noblin as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29206941) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NY missing. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Radnet, Inc. answer now due 1/4/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Radnet, Inc..(Attorney Alisha C Burgin added to party Radnet, Inc.(pty:dft))(Burgin, Alisha)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29206941) filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Green, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster, upon Defendant Radnet, Inc. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luis DOE - Person In Charge of Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-09553 RGK (SKx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10180 RGK (SKx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (esa)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10180 DSF (PDx). (esa)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10180 CBM (PDx). (esa)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to 21 Radnet, Inc. (lh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. (Noblin, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster, (Noblin, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. (Noblin, James)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28873561 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kelly Lancaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney James Robert Noblin added to party Kelly Lancaster(pty:pla))(Noblin, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly Lancaster v. Radnet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lancaster
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: Emrah M. Sumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radnet, Inc.
Represented By: Alisha C. Burgin
Represented By: Sunita Bali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?